# Amazing Maths Multiplication Tricks with Numbers

March 05, 2017

*Edit***Maths Multiplication Tricks with Numbers | mathjokes.net**

Maths Multiplication Tricks with Numbers

Here we have mentioned few math multiplication tricks to play. You can play these tricks as instructed, with your parents or friends and prove your talent to them.

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks : **MULTIPLICATION OF 2 TWO-DIGIT NUMBERS

Math tricks example 1:To calculate 56×54:

Multiply 5 by 5+1. So, 5*6 = 30. Write down 30.

Multiply together the last digits: 6*4 = 24. Write down 24.

The product of 56 and 54 is thus 3024.

Math tricks example 2:

78*72 = [7*(7+1)][8*2] = 5616

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER BY 6

If the two numbers differ by 6 then their product is the square of their average minus 9.Math tricks example 1:

10*16 = 13^2 - 9 = 160

22*28 = 25^2 - 9 = 616

Math tricks example 2:

997*1003 = 1000^2 - 9 = 999991

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER BY 4

If two numbers differ by 4, then their product is the square of the number in the middle (the average of the two numbers) minus 4.Math tricks example 1:

22*26 = 24^2 - 4 = 572

98*102 = 100^2 - 4 = 9996

Math tricks example 2:

148*152 = 150^2 - 4 = 22496

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS THAT DIFFER BY 2

This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers. When two numbers differ by 2, their product is always the square of the number in between these numbers minus 1.Math tricks example 1:18*20 = 19^2 - 1 = 361 - 1 = 36025*27 = 26^2 - 1 = 676 - 1 = 675

Math tricks example 2: Understand the rule by 1

more example

49*51 = 50^2 - 1 = 2500 - 1 = 2499

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 125 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 93*125 = 93000/8 = 11625.

2. 137*125 = 137000/8 = 17125.

Math tricks example 2:

3786*125 = 3786000/8 = 473250.

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **EASY AND FAST MULTIPLICATION OF 25 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 67*25 = 6700/4 = 1675.

2. 298*25 = 29800/4 = 7450.

Math tricks example 2:

5923*25 = 592300/4 = 148075.

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 5 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245.

2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265.

Math tricks example 2:

5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245.

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 999 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 51*999 = 51*(1000-1) = 51*1000-51 = 51000-51 = 50949.

2. 147*999 = 147*(1000-1) = 147000-147 = 146853.

Math tricks example 2:

3825*999 = 3825*(1000-1) = 3825000-3825 = 3821175

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 99 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.

2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.

Math tricks example 2:

Understand the rule by 1 more example

2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 99 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.

2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.

Math tricks example 2:

Understand the rule by 1 more example

2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 9 WITH ANY NUMBER

Math tricks example 1:1. 18*9 = 18*(10-1) = 18*10-18 = 180-18 = 162.

2. 187*9 = 187*(10-1) = 1870-187 = 1683.

Math tricks example 2:

Understand the rule by 1 more example

1864*9 = 1864*(10-1) = 18640-1864 = 16776

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 11 WITH ANY NUMBER.

Math tricks example 1:1) 234163*11 = 2---2+3---3+4---4+1---1+6---6+3---3 = 2575793

Means insert the sum of 2 successive digits and put 2 terminal digits in its place

2) 45345181*11 = 4---4+5---5+3---3+4---4+5---5+1---1+8---8+1---1 = 498796991

Math tricks example 2:

Here an extra case arises

Consider the following examples for that

3) 473927*11 = 4+1--- (4+7-10) +1--- (7+3-10) +1--- (3+9-10) +1--- (9+2-10)--- (2+7) ---7 = 5213197

4) 584536*11 = 5+1---(5+8-10)+1---(8+4-10)---(4+5)---(5+3)---(3+6)---6 = 6429896

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 11 WITH ANY NUMBER OF 2 DIGITS.

Math tricks example 1:35*11 = 3---(3+5)---5 = 385

Means insert the sum of first and second digits between the two digits of the number

27*11 = 2---(2+7)---7 = 297

Math tricks example 2: Here an extra case arises

Consider the following examples for that

39*11 = 3+1---(3+9-10)---9 = 429

Means, if sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then add 1 to first digit and subtract 10 to the inserted term.

78*11 = 7+1---(7+8-10)---8 = 858

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **Multiply by 5

Step1:Take any number, then divide it by 2

Step2:

If the result is whole, add a 0 at the end.

Step3:

If it is not, ignore the remainder and add a 5 at the end.

Step4:

2682 x 5 = (2682 / 2) & 5 or 0

Step5:

2682 / 2 = 1341 (whole number so add 0)

Step6:

Ans:13410

Step7:

Let's try another:5887 x 5,2943.5 (fractional numbers (ignore remainder, add 5)

Answer: 29435

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **Tough Multiplication

Step1:If you have a large number to multiply and one of the numbers is even, you can easily subdivide to get to the answer

Step2:

Ex:32 x 125, is the same as: 16 x 250 is the same as: 8 x 500 is the same as: 4 x 1000 = 4,000

Trick 4: Subtracting from 1,000

Step1:

To subtract a large number from 1,000 you can use this basic rule: subtract all but the last number from 9, then subtract the last number from 10:

Step2:

Ex:1000-648

Step3:

subtract 6 from 9 = 3

Step4:

subtract 4 from 9 = 5

step5:

subtract 8 from 10 = 2

Answer: 352

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF ANY TWO NUMBERS, LIES BETWEEN 11 AND 19

13*19 = (13+9)*10 + (3*9) = 220 + 27 = 247Means add first number and last digit of the second number take zero in the third place of this number then add product of last digit of the two numbers in it. Math tricks example 2: 18*14 = (18+4)*10 + (8*4) = 220 + 32 = 252

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **MULTIPLICATION OF 11 WITH ANY NUMBER OF 3 DIGITS.

1. 352*11 = 3---(3+5)---(5+2)---2 = 3872Means insert the sum of first and second digits, then sum of second and third digits between the two terminal digits of the number

2. 213*11 = 2---(2+1)---(1+3)---3 = 2343

Math tricks example 2: Here an extra case arises

Consider the following examples for that

1) 329*11 = 3--- (3+2) +1--- (2+9-10) ---9 = 3619

Means, if sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then add 1 to previous digit and subtract 10 to the associated digit.

2) 758*11 = 7+1---(7+5-10)+1---(5+8-10)---8 = 8338

###
**Maths Multiplication Tricks: **Multiplying Two-digit Numbers By 11

This math multiplication trick helps you to multiply any two digit number by 11 easily and quickly.Multiplying Two-digit Numbers By 11

Example 1:

Let us take the example of 12 * 11

Step 1:

In the first step, let us focus on 12.

Split the number 12 like this,1-------2

Step 2:

Now add the two digits of 12

That is1+2=3

Step 3:

Place 3 in the middle of the two digits of 12 and the result is 132

Now, we have arrived at the answer for 12*11=132.

Example 2:

Now let us take another example.65 * 11

Step 1:

As mentioned above in the first step, focus on 65.

Split the number 65 like this,6-------5

Step 2:

Now add the two digits of 65

That is6+5=11

Step 3:

However, we cannot place 11 in the middle of the two digits of 65.Write 1 in between 6 and 5. Carry over the remaining 1 to the previous number 6 as given below.

Add the 1 with 6 to get the digit in the hundredth place.

We have arrived at the answer for 65*11=715.

Next: Math Multiplication Tricks